EP4072344 - ORAL PRODUCTS WITH IMPROVED BINDING OF ACTIVE INGREDIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEESON, Dwayne William c/o Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London, Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
HUTCHENS, Ronald K. c/o Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London, Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 03 /
KELLER, Christopher c/o Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London, Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 04 /
POOLE, Thomas H. c/o Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London, Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 05 /
SEBASTIAN, Andries Don c/o Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London, Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 06 /
ST. CHARLES, Frank Kelley c/o Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London, Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 07 /
GERARDI, Anthony Richard 5208 Mountain View Road Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27104 / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Newcombe, Christopher David, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20842723.7 | 07.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020IB61592 | Priority number, date | US201916707602 | 09.12.2019 Original published format: US201916707602 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021116878 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072344 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24B13/00, A24B15/16, A61K9/00, A61K31/465 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/465 (EP);
A24B13/00 (EP,US);
A24B15/281 (US);
A24B15/301 (US);
A24B15/303 (US);
A24B15/308 (US);
A24B15/32 (US);
A24B15/34 (US);
A24B15/403 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | ORALE PRODUKTE MIT VERBESSERTER WIRKSTOFFBINDUNG | [2022/42] | English: | ORAL PRODUCTS WITH IMPROVED BINDING OF ACTIVE INGREDIENTS | [2022/42] | French: | PRODUITS ORAUX À LIAISON AMÉLIORÉE D'INGRÉDIENTS ACTIFS | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 06.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO03039518 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13,15-23 * page 1 - page 2, line 14; examples 1-5 * [I] 12,24; | [XI]WO2004056363 (NICONOVUM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-11,13,15-23 * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 32 * * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 16, line 15 - page 21 * * page 11, line 18 - line 26 * * page 12, line 25 - line 31 * [I] 12,14,24; | [XI]WO2006000232 (FERTIN PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,13,15-21 * page 1, line 4 - line 24 * * page 23, line 23 - page 26, line 16; examples 1-11 * [I] 7,10-12,22-24; | [XI]WO2018197454 (SWEDISH MATCH NORTH EUROPE AB [SE]) [X] 1-11,13-23 * page 1 - page 2, line 2 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 18; examples 1-3; claims 1-29 * [I] 12,24; | [XI]US2019083393 (AXELSSON ANDERS [SE], et al) [X] 1-11,13-23 * paragraph [0014]; examples 1-5; claims 1-47 * * paragraph [0001] * [I] 12,24; | [A] - ROBICHAUD MEAGAN O. ET AL, "Tobacco companies introduce 'tobacco-free' nicotine pouches", TOBACCO CONTROL, GB, vol. 29, doi:10.1136/tobaccocontrol-2019-055321, ISSN 0964-4563, (20191121), pages e145 - e146, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC7239723/pdf/nihms-1061097.pdf, XP055798341 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/tobaccocontrol-2019-055321 | by applicant | US787611 | US1086306 | US1376586 | US1437095 | US1757477 | US2033909 | US2122421 | US2148147 | US2170107 | US2274649 | US2770239 | US3612065 | US3851653 | US3889689 | US3901248 | US3943940 | US3943945 | US4143666 | US4144895 | US4148325 | US4150677 | US4194514 | US4267847 | US4289147 | US4340073 | US4351346 | US4359059 | US4366823 | US4366824 | US4388933 | US4506682 | US4513756 | US4528993 | US4589428 | US4605016 | US4624269 | US4641667 | US4660577 | US4716911 | US4725440 | US4727889 | US4887618 | US4941484 | US4967771 | US4986286 | US4987907 | US4991599 | US5005593 | US5018540 | US5060669 | US5065775 | US5074319 | US5092352 | US5099862 | US5121757 | US5131414 | US5131415 | US5148819 | US5167244 | US5197494 | US5230354 | US5234008 | US5243999 | US5259403 | US5301694 | US5318050 | US5343879 | US5360022 | US5387416 | US5435325 | US5445169 | US5539093 | WO9631255 | US5668295 | US5705624 | US5713376 | US5844119 | US5908032 | US6077524 | US6131584 | US6298859 | US6510855 | US6668839 | US2004020503 | US6730832 | US6772767 | US2004191322 | WO2004095959 | US6834654 | US6887307 | WO2005041699 | US6895974 | US2005115580 | WO2005063060 | US6923981 | US6953040 | US2005244521 | US7014039 | US7025066 | US7032601 | US2006191548 | US2006236434 | US7173170 | US2007062549 | US7208659 | US7230160 | US2007186941 | US2007186942 | US2008029110 | US2008029116 | US7337782 | US2008173317 | US2008196730 | US2008209586 | WO2008103935 | US2008305216 | US2009014343 | US2009014450 | US2009065013 | US7537110 | USD592956S | USD594154S | US7556047 | US7584843 | US2009223989 | US2009230003 | US2009250360 | US2009266837 | US2009293889 | US7650892 | US2010084424 | US7694686 | US2010133140 | US7798153 | USD625178S | US2010264157 | US2010282267 | US2010291245 | WO2010132444 | US7861728 | US2011139164 | US2011168712 | US2011247640 | US8061362 | US2012037175 | US2012055494 | US2012067361 | US8186360 | US2012138073 | US2012138074 | US8397945 | US2013074855 | US2013074856 | US8434496 | US2013152953 | US2013274296 | US8931493 | US8944072 | US2015068545 | US8991403 | US2015101627 | US2015230515 | US2016000140 | US9237769 | US2016073686 | US2016073689 | US9339058 | US2016157515 | US2016192703 | US9420825 | US2017020183 | US2017112183 | US9950858 | WO2018083114 | - SANTHOSH et al., Phytomedicine, (20050000), vol. 12, pages 216 - 220 | - PERFETTI, Beitrage Tabakforschung Int., (19830000), vol. 12, pages 43 - 54 | - NESTOR et al., Beitrage Tabakforsch. Int., (20030000), vol. 20, pages 467 - 475 | - STAAF et al., Beitrage Tabakforsch. Int., (20050000), vol. 21, pages 321 - 330 | - The EFSA Journal, (20040000), vol. 85, pages 1 - 32 |