EP4076301 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR RECEIVING DISCHARGED URINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purewick Corporation 2030 Gillespie Way, Suite 109 El Cajon, California 92020 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANNES, Ashley Marie 1225 Greenleffe Drive Statham, Georgia 30066 / US | 02 /
WOLFE, Justin 781 Providence Drive Lawrenceville, Georgia 30044 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20842751.8 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020US65234 | Priority number, date | US201962949187P | 17.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962949187 P | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021126920 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076301 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/453 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61F5/453 (EP,US);
A61F5/4408 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFNAHME VON AUSGESCHIEDENEM URIN | [2022/43] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR RECEIVING DISCHARGED URINE | [2022/43] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA RÉCEPTION D'URINE EXCRÉTÉE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 06.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015135423 (SHARPE ISABELLA K [US], et al); | [A]US2019133814 (TAMMEN MELISSA KAY [US], et al); | [I]US2019247222 (ECKLUND BRIAN J [US], et al) |