EP3868167 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE TO EVERYTHING (V2X) COMMUNICATION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Min 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
ZHOU, Miao 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
SUN, Feifei 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 20843162.7 | 17.07.2020 | [2021/34] | WO2020KR09483 | Priority number, date | CN201910657208 | 19.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910657208 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021015506 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868167 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L5/00, H04L1/00, H04W52/14, H04W52/30, H04W4/40, H04W72/04, // H04L1/18, H04W72/10, H04W88/06, H04W92/18 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04W72/25 (KR);
H04W4/40 (CN,KR,US);
H04W72/53 (US);
H04L1/1887 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L5/0098 (US);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W52/367 (KR);
H04W52/383 (KR);
H04W72/0466 (US);
H04W72/1215 (KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W72/232 (KR);
H04W72/56 (EP,US);
H04W72/569 (KR);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,KR);
H04W88/08 (KR);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0064 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | H04W72/12, H04L5/00, H04L1/00, H04W52/14, H04W52/30, H04W4/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FAHRZEUG-ZU-ALLEM(V2X)-KOMMUNIKATION IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/34] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE TO EVERYTHING (V2X) COMMUNICATION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2021/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UNE COMMUNICATION DE VÉHICULE À TOUT (V2X) DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 04.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018279303 (SUN HAITONG [US], et al); |