EP4004828 - TRAINING METHODS FOR DEEP NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Research Institute, Inc. 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, California 94022 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STONE, Kevin 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
SHANKAR, Krishna 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
LASKEY, Michael 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20844011.5 | 05.06.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US36450 | Priority number, date | US201962877792P | 23.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962877792 P | US201962877791P | 23.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962877791 P | US201962877793P | 23.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962877793 P | US201916570813 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: US201916570813 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021015869 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004828 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/20, G06V10/82, G06V10/764, G06V10/774, G06N3/08, G06N3/045, G06T13/00, G06T1/00, G06T7/246, H04N13/204, B25J9/16 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G06T7/248 (EP,US);
B25J9/1605 (CN,US);
G06V20/10 (US);
B25J9/1661 (CN,US);
B25J9/1664 (CN,US);
B25J9/1671 (EP,CN,US);
B25J9/1697 (EP,CN,US);
G06F18/214 (CN,US);
G06F18/28 (CN,US);
G06N3/08 (EP,CN,US);
G06T19/20 (CN,US);
G06T7/33 (US);
G06T7/55 (CN,US);
G06T7/74 (CN,US);
G06V10/751 (US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/774 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/20 (EP,US);
B25J9/163 (US);
B25J9/1666 (EP);
G05B2219/37567 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40136 (EP);
G05B2219/40543 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40564 (EP,US);
G06N20/10 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06T2200/04 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/20104 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | G06N3/08, G06T13/00, G06T1/00, H04N13/204 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | TRAININGSVERFAHREN FÜR TIEFE NETZE | [2022/22] | English: | TRAINING METHODS FOR DEEP NETWORKS | [2022/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'APPRENTISSAGE DE RÉSEAUX PROFONDS | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 05.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - Wald Johanna ET AL, "RIO: 3D Object Instance Re-Localization in Changing Indoor Environments", 2019 IEEE/CVF International Conference on Computer Vision (ICCV), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2019.00775, ISBN 978-1-7281-4803-8, (20190816), pages 7657 - 7666, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1908.06109.pdf, (20230606), XP093052011 [XP] 1-6 * Section 1; Section 3; Section 4;; figures 1, 6, 7, 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2019.00775 | [A] - VARGHESE ASHLEY ET AL, ChangeNet: A Deep Learning Architecture for Visual Change Detection, ADVANCES IN DATABASES AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CHAM, PAGE(S) 129 - 145, (20190129), ISBN 978-3-319-10403-4, XP047501655 [A] 1-6 * Section 3;; figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-030-11012-3_10 | International search | [Y]US2016275376 (KANT SHASHI [US]) [Y] 1-20; | [A]US2018285697 (SHOTTON JAMIE DANIEL JOSEPH [GB], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2019102601 (KARPAS LESLIE [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2019130218 (ALBRIGHT EVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]JP2019096062 (KONICA MINOLTA INC)[A] 1-20; | [Y]US10332261 (FARIVAR REZA [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 |