EP4004651 - REPLACEABLE TONER CARTRIDGE WITH INLET PORT FOR RECYCLED TONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Kenji 3-4-39 Tsurumi Chuo Tsurumi-ku Yokohama, Kanagawa 230--0051 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Takahiko 3-4-39 Tsurumi Chuo Tsurumi-ku Yokohama, Kanagawa 230--0051 / JP | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20844015.6 | 16.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US42342 | Priority number, date | JP20190135393 | 23.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019135393 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021016038 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004651 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, G03G21/10 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
G03G15/0844 (EP);
G03G15/0877 (EP,US);
G03G21/105 (EP);
G03G21/12 (EP,US);
G03G15/0867 (EP,US);
G03G15/0886 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | G03G15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | AUSTAUSCHBARE TONERKARTUSCHE MIT EINLASSÖFFNUNG FÜR RECYCELTEN TONER | [2022/22] | English: | REPLACEABLE TONER CARTRIDGE WITH INLET PORT FOR RECYCLED TONER | [2022/22] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE TONER REMPLAÇABLE AVEC ORIFICE D'ENTRÉE POUR TONER RECYCLÉ | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 13.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5508794 (IKESUE MASUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 3, line 24 - column 9, line 28; figures 1-11 *; | [X]US2001043826 (MIZOGUCHI FUMITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0091]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2005254860 (KIMURA MASAMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0096]; figures 1-15 *; | [X]US2012027459 (SATO SHOUGO [JP]) [X] 1,10,14,15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0104]; figures 1-14 *; | [X]US2017168426 (IZUMI KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,10,12 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0111]; figures 1-14 *; | [A]EP3430477 (KATUN CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]EP0650103 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US])[A] 1-15; | [A]US2004114944 (URABE KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-15; | [A]US10126705 (PIENING CHAD MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 | by applicant | US5508794 | US2001043826 | US2005254860 | US2012027459 | US2017168426 |