EP3999881 - OBSTACLE DETECTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 925 N. Eldridge Parkway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOANG, Phuong c/o CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY 925 N. Eldridge Parkway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | 02 /
SOOFI, Khalid A. c/o CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY 925 N. Eldridge Parkway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | 03 /
LASCAUD, Benjamin c/o CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY 925 N. Eldridge Parkway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | 04 /
BOYLE, Patrick R. c/o CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY 925 N. Eldridge Parkway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20844077.6 | 21.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020US42918 | Priority number, date | US201962876727P | 21.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962876727 P | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021016266 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999881 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01V11/00, G01V3/02, G01S17/88, G01S17/89, G01V3/04, E21B49/00, G01C11/02, G01C15/00 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
G01V11/00 (EP);
G01V3/20 (US);
E21B49/00 (EP,US);
G01C11/00 (US);
G01C15/002 (EP,US);
G01V3/04 (EP);
G01C11/025 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | G01V11/00, G01V1/00, G01V3/08, G01V7/00, G01S17/88, G01S17/89 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | HINDERNISERKENNUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2022/21] | English: | OBSTACLE DETECTION SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2022/21] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION D'OBSTACLE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 17.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7796468 (KELLOGG STEPHEN C [SA]); | [A]CN107045147 (ZHEJIANG INST HYDRAULICS & ESTUARY, et al); | [A]WO2018217875 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al); | International search | [A]US4068160 (HUNT HUBERT B); | [A]US6502037 (JORGENSEN GREGORY JOSEPH [US], et al); | [A]US2005240348 (KNIGHT BYRON F [US], et al); | [A]US2007038378 (GELFAND MARK [CA], et al); | [A]US2007255501 (KELLOGG STEPHEN C [SA]); | [A]US2010091611 (LAAKE ANDREAS [GB]); | [A]WO2018217875 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2019204464 (MOORE III PAUL J [US], et al) |