EP3992955 - COMPOSITE STRUCTURE, FLEXIBLE SCREEN ASSEMBLY, AND FOLDING DISPLAY TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Xu Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
MA, Chunjun Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20844699.7 | 21.07.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN103370 | Priority number, date | CN201910678494 | 25.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910678494 | [2022/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021013160 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992955 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F1/20, G09F9/30, H04M1/02 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
G06F1/203 (EP);
G09F9/301 (EP,CN);
H05K5/04 (US);
F28F21/089 (US);
G06F1/1637 (EP);
G06F1/1641 (EP);
G06F1/1652 (EP);
H04M1/0214 (EP);
H04M1/0268 (EP,CN);
H05K5/0017 (US);
H05K7/20963 (CN,US);
C09K5/14 (US);
H10K2102/311 (US);
H10K50/87 (US);
H10K59/12 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | G09F9/30, H05K7/20, H04M1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | VERBUNDSTRUKTUR, FLEXIBLE BILDSCHIRMANORDNUNG UND ENDGERÄT MIT FALTBAREM BILDSCHIRM | [2022/18] | English: | COMPOSITE STRUCTURE, FLEXIBLE SCREEN ASSEMBLY, AND FOLDING DISPLAY TERMINAL | [2022/18] | French: | STRUCTURE COMPOSITE, ENSEMBLE ÉCRAN FLEXIBLE ET TERMINAL D'AFFICHAGE PLIABLE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2022 | Translation filed | 25.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016212890 (JEONG GYEONG HO [KR], et al); | [XI]WO2019047383 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS SEMICONDUCTOR DISPLAY TECH CO LTD [CN]) |