Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4077262 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2020405133 AU2023204703 AU2024266730 CA3162919 CN202080087938 EP20845273 JP2022538235 KR20227024175 US2020066047W US202117351550

More

US202217673335 US202318221075 US202418676957



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2021127461Global Dossier 24.06.2021A1
Priority number Date
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024351975Global Dossier 24.10.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202318221075 12.07.2023
US202117351550 18.06.2021
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
US202217673335 16.02.2022
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
US202418676957 29.05.2024
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12030834Global Dossier 09.07.2024B2
US2023357130 09.11.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202318221075 12.07.2023
US202117351550 18.06.2021
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
US202217673335 16.02.2022
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11746081Global Dossier 05.09.2023B2
US2022234994 28.07.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202117351550 18.06.2021
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
US202217673335 16.02.2022
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11279669Global Dossier 22.03.2022B2
US2022055982 24.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20220133189Global Dossier 04.10.2022A
Priority number Date
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7483890BGlobal Dossier 15.05.2024B2
JP2023522519 31.05.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN115244028Global Dossier 25.10.2022A
Priority number Date
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3162919Global Dossier 24.06.2021A1
Priority number Date
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2024266730Global Dossier 12.12.2024A1
Priority number Date
AU2023204703 14.07.2023
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
AU2024266730 20.11.2024
AU2020405133 18.12.2020
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2023204703BGlobal Dossier 12.09.2024B2
AU2023204703 10.08.2023A1
Priority number Date
AU2023204703 14.07.2023
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
AU2020405133 18.12.2020
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2020405133BGlobal Dossier 27.04.2023B2
AU2020405133 26.05.2022A1
Priority number Date
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4077262Global Dossier 24.07.2024C0
EP4077262Global Dossier 24.07.2024B1
EP4077262 26.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019
WO2020US66047 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW202136194 01.10.2021A
Priority number Date
WO2019CN127065 20.12.2019