EP3996443 - REDUCTION OF DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL OVERHEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/19] | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | ||
[2024/16] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Yawei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Chaojun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20845879.4 | 21.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020CN103317 | Priority number, date | CN201910704667 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910704667 | [2022/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021017949 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996443 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3996443 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04B7/0452, H04L5/00 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
H04B7/0452 (EP);
H04L5/005 (US);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN);
H04W72/0453 (CN);
H04W72/23 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDUZIERUNG DES DOWNLINK-KONTROLLKANAL-ZUSCHLAGS | [2024/16] | English: | REDUCTION OF DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL OVERHEAD | [2024/16] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE LA SURCHARGE DU CANAL DE CONTRÔLE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE | [2024/16] |
Former [2022/19] | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | ||
Former [2022/19] | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | ||
Former [2022/19] | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2022 | Translation filed | 07.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 21.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2011142620 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [A]US2018167959 (LIAO PEI-KAI [TW], et al); |