EP4004580 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDOOR LOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonprox Corporation 3830 Valley Centre Drive, Suite 146 San Diego CA 92130 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNIS, Saed c/o Lonprox Corporation 3830 Valley Centre Drive, 146 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
CHAFFIN, Wesley J. c/o Lonprox Corporation 3830 Valley Centre Drive, 146 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
DANANDEH, Nathaniel c/o Lonprox Corporation 3830 Valley Centre Drive, 146 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 20845957.8 | 27.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US43725 | Priority number, date | US201962879884P | 29.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962879884 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021727 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004580 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/02, G01S5/04, H04B1/707, H04J13/00, H04W4/02 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G01S5/021 (EP,CN,KR);
G01S19/396 (KR,US);
H04B1/7073 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01S1/024 (EP,CN,KR);
G01S1/0426 (EP,CN);
G01S1/0428 (EP,CN,KR);
G01S19/40 (KR,US);
G01S5/0027 (EP,CN,KR);
G01S5/0242 (EP,CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | G01S5/04, H04B1/707, H04J13/00, H04W4/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INNENRAUMORTUNG | [2022/22] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDOOR LOCATION | [2022/22] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR EMPLACEMENT INTÉRIEUR | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 26.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2015271643 (JALALI AHMAD [US]); | [Y]US2016261306 (SELLER OLIVIER BERNARD ANDRE [FR], et al); | [YA]US2018310272 (YOUNIS SAED [US]) | International search | [Y]US2015092754 (GUPTA ALOK KUMAR [US]); | [A]US2015341881 (HILTUNEN ANTTI [FI], et al); | [A]JP2017015562 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP); | [Y]US2018310272 (YOUNIS SAED [US]); | [Y]US10151844 (PAHLAVAN KOUROSH [US], et al) |