EP4004630 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUGMENTED REALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, FL 33322 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHRICH, Daniel LeWinn 501 NE 31st Street, Unit 4104 Miami, Florida 33137 / US | 02 /
LUNDMARK, David C. 906 Seena Avenue Los Altos, California 94024 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20846338.0 | 24.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US43596 | Priority number, date | US201962879408P | 26.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962879408 P | US201962881355P | 31.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962881355 P | US201962899678P | 12.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962899678 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021670 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004630 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G06T19/00, A63F13/213, A63F13/26, A63F13/30 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
A63F13/211 (EP);
A63F13/212 (EP);
A63F13/213 (EP);
A63F13/25 (EP);
A63F13/428 (EP);
A63F13/5255 (EP);
A63F13/655 (EP);
G06F18/23 (US);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/013 (US);
G06F3/014 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR ERWEITERTE REALITÄT | [2022/22] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUGMENTED REALITY | [2022/22] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2013050258 (LIU JAMES CHIA-MING [US], et al) [I] 1-4,6-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 162] , [0 44] , [ 133] , [0 55]; figure 1 * [Y] 5; | [A]US2014340498 (PLAGEMANN CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [A] 6* paragraphs [0001] , [0 32] *; | [Y]US2019155439 (MUKHERJEE DEBANJAN [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0003] *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Koi Pond: Top iPhone App Store Paid App", (20080904), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20080904061233/https://www.iphoneincanada.ca/reviews/koi-pond-top-iphone-app-store-paid-app/, (20220809), XP055950079 [A] 9-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2012249741 (MACIOCCI GIULIANO [GB], et al) [A] 1-48, 58-66, 73-78,95-124 * entire document *; | [A]US2015130790 (VASQUEZ II JOSEPH GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1-48, 58-66, 73-78,95-124 * entire document *; | [A]US2015205126 (SCHOWENGERDT BRIAN T [US]) [A] 1-48, 58-66, 73-78,95-124 * entire document *; | [A]US2016027215 (BURNS AARON [US], et al) [A] 1-48, 58-66, 73-78, 95-124 * entire document *; | [A]US2018250589 (COSSAIRT TRAVIS [US], et al) [A] 1-48, 58-66, 73-78,95-124* entire document *; | [A] - BUTAIL Sachit, Amanda Chicoli; Derek A Paley, "Putting the fish in the fish tank: Immersive VR for animal behavior experiments", 2012 IEEE International Conference on Robotics and Automation, doi:10.1109/ICRA.2012.6225102, (20120518), pages 5018 - 5023, URL: http://cdcl.umd.edu/papers/icra2012.pdf, (20201114), XP032194697 [A] 1-48, 58-66, 73-78,95-124 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICRA.2012.6225102 |