Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
07.02.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.09.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.06.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
30.09.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
30.09.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
27.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.04.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
29.04.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
11.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.02.2022 | Change - representative | |
25.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.02.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |