Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11922712 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | B2 | US2022319219 | 06.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US43482 | 24.07.2020 | US201962890234 | 22.08.2019 | US201962878931 | 26.07.2019 | US202017627719 | 24.07.2020 | US202062981763 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4004811 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2023 | A4 | EP4004811 | 01.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US43482 | 24.07.2020 | US201962890234 | 22.08.2019 | US201962878931 | 26.07.2019 | US202062981763 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021021624 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962890234 | 22.08.2019 | US201962878931 | 26.07.2019 | US202062981763 | 26.02.2020 |