EP4004811 - TECHNOLOGIES FOR CONTENT ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patnotate LLC 5 Tenafly Road, Suite 413 Engelwood, New Jersey 07631 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSIBULEVSKIY, Roman 5 Tenafly Road, Suite 413 Englewood, New Jersey 07631 / US | 02 /
GREENBAUM, Gary 5 Tenafly Road, Suite 413 Englewood, New Jersey 07631 / US | 03 /
IVAKHNENKO, Alexander 5 Tenafly Road, Suite 413 Englewood, New Jersey 07631 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20846869.4 | 24.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US43482 | Priority number, date | US201962878931P | 26.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962878931 P | US201962890234P | 22.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962890234 P | US202062981763P | 26.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062981763 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021624 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004811 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F18/40, G06V30/226, G06V30/422 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G06V30/422 (EP,US);
G06F18/40 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F9/451 (US);
G06Q50/184 (US);
G06T3/60 (US);
G06V30/226 (EP,US);
G06V30/413 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | TECHNOLOGIEN ZUR INHALTSANALYSE | [2022/22] | English: | TECHNOLOGIES FOR CONTENT ANALYSIS | [2022/22] | French: | TECHNOLOGIES D'ANALYSE DE CONTENU | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 16.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014200880 (NEUSTEL MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10,14,15 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0041]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0052]; figure 21 * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0105]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0142]; figures 23,24 *[I] 8,11-13 | International search | [Y]US2008005103 (RATCLIFFE PAUL L [US], et al) [Y] 15, 16* , entire document especially Fig. 5; para [0060], [0129], [0158] *; | [XY]US2016154786 (NEUSTEL MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1-14, 17-20 * , entire document especially abstract; Fig. 4, 21, 24, 26; para [0074], [0080], [0108], [0112], [0114], [0125], [0126], [0143], [0156] * [Y] 15, 16 |