EP4004040 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INDUCING NOTCH SIGNALING IN TUMOR MICROENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fred Hutchinson Cancer Center 1100 Fairview Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2022/35] |
Former [2022/22] | For all designated states Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center 1100 Fairview Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNSTEIN, Irwin D. c/o Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center 1100 Fairview Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | 02 /
FURUYAMA, Suzanne c/o Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center 1100 Fairview Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20847148.2 | 28.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US43900 | Priority number, date | US201962880014P | 29.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962880014 P | US202063001136P | 27.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063001136 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021825 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004040 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/22, A61K39/00, A61P35/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/70 (EP);
C07K2317/75 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR INDUZIERUNG VON NOTCH-SIGNALISIERUNG IN TUMORMIKROUMGEBUNGEN | [2022/22] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INDUCING NOTCH SIGNALING IN TUMOR MICROENVIRONMENTS | [2022/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT D'INDUIRE UNE SIGNALISATION NOTCH DANS DES MICROENVIRONNEMENTS TUMORAUX | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018017827 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 31, line 19 - line 24 *; | [A] - OWEN DWIGHT H. ET AL, "DLL3: an emerging target in small cell lung cancer", JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY & ONCOLOGY, vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s13045-019-0745-2, (20190618), URL: http://link.springer.com/article/10.1186/s13045-019-0745-2/fulltext.html, XP093061358 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 5, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13045-019-0745-2 | [A] - WIERSMA REBECCA E ET AL, "A Novel DLL1-Anti-CD19 Chimeric Protein Effectively Targets Notch Activation to B-Cell Acute Lymphoblastic Leukemia and Induces Cell Death", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20151203), vol. 126, no. 23, doi:10.1182/BLOOD.V126.23.4833.4833, ISSN 0006-4971, page 4833, XP086647942 [A] 1-15 * Background * * Methods * * Results * * Conclusions * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V126.23.4833.4833 | International search | [Y]US2015259433 (KAHNERT ANTJE [DE], et al) [Y] 40* Especially para [0050] *; | [Y]US2016009824 (LO KIN-MING [US], et al) [Y] 1-28, 31-33, 37, 39-42 * Especially para [0087], claim 14 *; | [Y]WO2018017827 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US], et al) [Y] 1-28, 31-33, 37, 39-42 * Especially abstract; pg 4, In 25-28; pg 6, In 1-3, pg 21, In 26-29; pg 2, In 4-5; pg 4 In 9-11, pg 6, In 26-32; pg 2, In 20-21; pg 2, In 20-21, Figs.2A, 2B, 7 *; | [Y] - Hossain Fokhrul, Majumder Samarpan, Ucar Deniz A., Rodriguez Paulo C., Golde Todd E., Minter Lisa M., Osborne Barbara A., Miele Lucio, "Notch Signaling in Myeloid Cells as a Regulator of Tumor immune Responses", Front. Immunol., (20180604), vol. 9, page 1288, XP055790932 [Y] 4-17, (18-28, 31-33, 37,39-42)/(4-17) * . Especially abstract; pg 2, col 2, para 1; pg 5, col 2, para 3; pg 4, col 1, para 1; pg 4, col 2, para 2; pg 4, col 1, para 1; pg 5, col 2, para 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fimmu.2018.01288 |