EP3919169 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2022/04] |
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYAMA Hiroaki c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
KAYAMA Hiroaki Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20847348.8 | 14.07.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020JP27331 | Priority number, date | JP20190141521 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019141521 | [2021/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021020101 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919169 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3919169 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01D39/20, B01D46/00, B01J32/00, C04B38/08, B01D46/24, F01N3/022 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
B01D46/2429 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,CN);
B01D46/0005 (US);
B01D39/2079 (EP);
B01D46/24491 (EP,US);
B01D46/24492 (EP,US);
B01D46/2459 (US);
C04B38/0006 (EP);
F01N3/035 (CN);
F01N3/2828 (CN);
F01N3/2882 (CN);
B01D2239/1208 (EP);
B01D2239/1216 (EP);
B01D2239/1241 (EP);
B01D2239/125 (EP);
B01D46/2455 (US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP);
F01N2250/02 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/00, C04B38/0054, C04B38/0074 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | B01J35/04, B01D39/20, B01D46/00, B01J32/00, C04B38/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSFILTER | [2021/49] | English: | EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION FILTER | [2021/49] | French: | FILTRE DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2021 | Translation filed | 31.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2644245 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A] - GRIGORIOS KOLTSAKIS ET AL, "Catalyzed diesel particulate filter modeling", REVIEWS IN CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, NL, (20130101), vol. 29, no. 1, doi:10.1515/revce-2012-0008, ISSN 0167-8299, pages 1 - 61, XP055697262 [A] 1-4 * page 20, line 6 - line 17; figure 41 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/revce-2012-0008 | International search | [A]WO03074848 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-6, page 21, line 21 to page 23, line 7, page 35, lines 14-28 *; | [A]WO2004076027 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-8, page 16, line 22 to page 18, line 21, page 22, line 4 to page 26, line 12 *; | [A]JP2011104524 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-16, fig. 16 *; | [A]JP2012045523 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-4* claims 1-6, fig. 1-2 * | by applicant | JP2019141521 |