EP3993384 - PIXEL ACQUISITION CIRCUIT, DYNAMIC VISION SENSOR, AND IMAGE ACQUISITION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Yifan Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Shan Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Jiantong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
XIAO, Jing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20847374.4 | 06.07.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN100454 | Priority number, date | CN201910684959 | 26.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910684959 | [2022/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021017766 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993384 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/217, H04N5/341, H04N5/3745, H04N5/232 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
H04N23/60 (EP,CN);
H04N23/81 (CN);
H04N25/75 (US);
H04N23/54 (CN);
H04N25/47 (EP,CN);
H04N25/50 (US);
H04N25/70 (CN);
H04N25/707 (EP);
H04N25/77 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | H04N5/217, H04N5/341 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | PIXELERFASSUNGSSCHALTUNG, DYNAMISCHER BILDSENSOR UND BILDERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | PIXEL ACQUISITION CIRCUIT, DYNAMIC VISION SENSOR, AND IMAGE ACQUISITION APPARATUS | [2022/18] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ACQUISITION DE PIXEL, CAPTEUR DE VISION DYNAMIQUE ET APPAREIL D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2022 | Translation filed | 31.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2016094787 (GOVIL ALOK [US], et al); | [Y]US2016227135 (MATOLIN DANIEL [DE], et al); | [E]EP3967027 (SONY ADVANCED VISUAL SENSING AG [CH]) |