12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
05.04.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
01.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
24.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
28.04.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
17.04.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.04.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.04.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.02.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.10.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.09.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
30.09.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
17.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
13.05.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
13.05.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
24.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
17.12.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
01.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.10.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
16.10.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
05.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|