EP4001815 - ELECTRODE DRYING DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH WATER SUPPLY PART, AND METHOD FOR DRYING ELECTRODE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2024/20] |
Former [2022/21] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyoung Ho LG CHEM Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20847966.7 | 15.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020KR09337 | Priority number, date | KR20190093890 | 01.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190093890 | [2022/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021020774 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001815 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4001815 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F26B3/12, F26B15/12, F26B21/00, F26B21/08, F26B3/04, F26B13/20, F26B13/12, F26B21/10, H01M4/00 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
F26B21/10 (EP,CN,US);
F26B3/12 (KR,US);
F26B13/00 (CN);
F26B21/005 (KR,US);
F26B13/104 (EP,US);
F26B13/12 (EP,US);
F26B15/12 (KR,US);
F26B21/002 (CN);
F26B21/003 (CN);
F26B21/004 (CN);
F26B21/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F26B21/12 (CN);
F26B3/04 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/0471 (EP,CN);
H01M4/139 (EP,CN);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | F26B3/12, F26B15/12, F26B21/00, F26B21/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENTROCKNUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM WASSERZUFUHRTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKNEN EINER ELEKTRODE DAMIT | [2022/21] | English: | ELECTRODE DRYING DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH WATER SUPPLY PART, AND METHOD FOR DRYING ELECTRODE USING SAME | [2022/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCHAGE D'UNE ÉLECTRODE COMPRENANT UNE PARTIE D'ALIMENTATION EN EAU, ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉCHAGE D'UNE ÉLECTRODE UTILISANT CELUI-CI | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2022 | Translation filed | 18.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2011080718 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-2 *; | [YA]CN102110803B (FUJIAN NANPING NANFU BATTERY) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0034] * [A] 11-13; | [A]CN102072620B (FUJIAN NANPING NANFU BATTERY) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0066] *; | [YA]WO2013039005 (DAIICHI JITSUGYO CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0033]; figures 1-2 * [A] 11-13; | [A]CN103165858 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * figure 9 *; | [A]US2017276429 (HEO KYOUNGHEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-2 * | International search | [Y]JP2010067579 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 11-13 * See paragraphs [0009] and [0030] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]JP2014001914 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-13* See claims 1 and 2 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2016079634 (ONODERA TAIGO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0017] and [0018] and figure 1. *; | [YX]KR20170109912 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 11-13 * See paragraphs [0031], [0036]-[0042], [0056], [0057] and [0061] and figures 1 and 2. * [X] 1-10; | [A]KR20180079841 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0064]-[0070] and figure 1. * | by applicant | KR20120057437 |