EP4006108 - COMPOSITE PIGMENT, IDENTIFICATION MEDIUM, AND AUTHENTICITY DETERMINATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIMATSU, Masashi c/o ZEON CORPORATION, 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20848478.2 | 21.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020JP28345 | Priority number, date | JP20190140314 | 30.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019140314 | [2022/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021020248 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4006108 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09B69/10, C08F220/34, C08L33/04, C08L101/00, C09D11/037, B42D25/364, B42D25/378, G07D7/12, G07D7/128, C08F2/48, C08F222/10, C09D4/00, C09D11/10, C09D133/08, G07D7/1205, C09B67/22, C09B67/02 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C09D11/037 (EP,CN,US);
C09K19/3852 (CN);
B42D25/364 (EP,CN,US);
B42D25/378 (EP,CN,US);
C08F2/48 (EP);
C08F222/1025 (EP);
C09B67/0033 (EP);
C09B67/0097 (EP);
C09B69/10 (EP,CN);
C09B69/107 (EP);
C09D11/10 (EP);
C09D11/101 (US);
C09D133/08 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP);
C09K19/36 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F222/1025, C08F220/34 (EP);
C09D133/08, C08K5/0041 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F222/1025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | C09B69/10, C08F220/34, C08L33/04, C08L101/00, C09D11/037, B42D25/364, B42D25/378, G07D7/12, G07D7/128 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | VERBUNDPIGMENT, IDENTIFIKATIONSMEDIUM UND ECHTHEITSBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/22] | English: | COMPOSITE PIGMENT, IDENTIFICATION MEDIUM, AND AUTHENTICITY DETERMINATION METHOD | [2022/22] | French: | PIGMENT COMPOSITE, SUPPORT D'IDENTIFICATION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE JUGEMENT D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2022 | Translation filed | 27.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003073600 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XI]EP1876216 (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * claims; paragraphs [0041] , [0078] , [0093] , [0 95]; examples 1,11 * [I] 5; | [I]EP3502755 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 39] , [0 40] , [0 42] - [0055] - [ 207] , [ 217] * * examples 1,2,4 * * claims 1,2,4 * | International search | [A]JPH1180733 (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND) [A] 1-9* , entire text *; | [A]JP2001261739 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2003145912 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [X]JP2009541047 (SICPA HOLDING SA) [X] 1-9 * , claims 1, 13, 15, paragraph [0089], table 1 *; | [A]JP2010196005 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [A]JP2014189677 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text *; | [X]WO2018034215 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5, 7-9 * , claim 4, paragraphs [0036], [0044], [0045], examples * | by applicant | JPH0672962 | JP2000290315 | US6468444 | JP2003066214 | JP2003073600 | JP2003313187 | JP2003342219 | JP2004115414 | JP2005289881 | JP2007176870 | JP2015027743 | US9800428 |