Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.08.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
18.08.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
18.08.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
09.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.10.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
07.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
07.10.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
06.05.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
11.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.03.2022 | Change - representative | |
01.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.02.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |