EP3862564 - LIGHT AND SHADOW FLICKER CONTROL METHOD FOR WIND TURBINE GENERATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XEMC Windpower Co. Ltd. No. 68 Ji' an Road Yuetang District Xiangtan Hunan 411102 / CN | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Langjun No. 68 Jiàn Road Yuetang District Xiangtan, Hunan 411102 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Lingxiang No. 68 Jiàn Road Yuetang District Xiangtan, Hunan 411102 / CN | 03 /
ZENG, Bing No. 68 Jiàn Road Yuetang District Xiangtan, Hunan 411102 / CN | 04 /
TAN, Zheng No. 68 Jiàn Road Yuetang District Xiangtan, Hunan 411102 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, SHuowang No. 68 Jiàn Road Yuetang District Xiangtan, Hunan 411102 / CN | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 20848778.5 | 30.10.2020 | [2021/32] | WO2020CN125135 | Priority number, date | CN201911300326 | 17.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911300326 | [2021/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021120885 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3862564 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3862564 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/20 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
F03D80/20 (EP,CN);
F03D7/00 (CN);
F03D7/0204 (EP);
F05B2270/19 (EP);
F05B2270/329 (EP,CN);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES SCHATTENWURFS EINER WINDENERGIEANLAGE | [2021/32] | English: | LIGHT AND SHADOW FLICKER CONTROL METHOD FOR WIND TURBINE GENERATOR SYSTEM | [2021/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PAPILLOTEMENT DE LUMIÈRE ET D'OMBRE POUR SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATEUR ÉOLIEN | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2021 | Translation filed | 08.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 22.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
IT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP4585151B (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] *; | [A]WO2013017648 (ALSTOM WIND SLU [ES], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure 3 *; | [A]CN105069274 (UNIV NORTH CHINA WATER & RESOU) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [I]CN103590975B (DALIAN SHINERGY SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY DEV CO LTD) [I] 1-6 * claim 2 *; | [XI]US2019271296 (RODRIGUEZ JIMENEZ GRECIA SOFIA [MX], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0039] - [0043]; figure 7 * [I] 2-6 |