EP3985789 - BUS BAR HAVING SURFACE PATTERN AND BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyung Mo 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
MOON, Jeong Oh 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jung Hoon 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHI, Ho June 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Jin Yong 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
JIN, Hee Jun 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 07 /
PARK, Jhin Ha 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20849463.3 | 31.07.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020KR10177 | Priority number, date | KR20190094098 | 02.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190094098 | [2022/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021025399 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3985789 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/505, H01M50/211, H01M50/516, H01M50/528 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H01M50/502 (KR);
H01M50/505 (EP,CN);
H01M50/503 (CN,US);
H01M50/516 (EP,US);
H01M50/528 (EP);
H01M50/543 (KR);
H01M50/557 (EP);
H01M50/562 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | H01M50/50, H01M50/543 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | SAMMELSCHIENE MIT OBERFLÄCHENMUSTER UND BATTERIEMODUL DAMIT | [2022/16] | English: | BUS BAR HAVING SURFACE PATTERN AND BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME | [2022/16] | French: | BARRE OMNIBUS AYANT UN MOTIF DE SURFACE ET MODULE DE BATTERIE LA COMPRENANT | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2022 | Translation filed | 13.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 14.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2757611 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,7,10* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2821174 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-8,10-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0039] - [0042]; figures 1-3 *; | [YA]WO2018221818 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-8,10-14 * paragraphs [0065] , [0075] - [0078] - [ 104] , [ 105]; figures 1-3 * [A] 9 | International search | [A]JP2011210482 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0022] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]KR20150089724 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14* See claims 8-10. *; | [A]KR20180097897 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0042] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]KR20180119991 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0061]-[0065] and figures 8-11. *; | [A]KR20180133698 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0067]-[0074] and figures 4-6. * |