EP4023219 - NANOEMULSION OF 18BETA-GLYCYRRHETINIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atso Corporate Affairs, S.A. De C.V. Meseta No. 232, Col. Jardines del Pedregal Coidad de Mexico, 01900 / MX | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENDEJAS HERNÁNDEZ, Ulises Segunda Cerrada de Olmecas S/N Santa Cruz Tlapacoya Ciudad de México, 56570 / MX | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20849613.3 | 07.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020MX50025 | Priority number, date | MX20190009482 | 08.08.2019 Original published format: MX 2019009482 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021025550 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | ES | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023219 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/19, A61K9/107, B82Y5/00, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61K47/10 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/44 (US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | A61K31/19, A61K9/107, B82Y5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Validation states | KH | 04.03.2022 | MA | 04.03.2022 | MD | 04.03.2022 | TN | 04.03.2022 | Title | German: | NANOEMULSION VON 18BETA-GLYCYRRHETINSÄURE | [2022/27] | English: | NANOEMULSION OF 18BETA-GLYCYRRHETINIC ACID | [2022/27] | French: | FORMES PHARMACEUTIQUES DE L'ACIDE18BETA-GLYCYRRHÉTINIQUE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2022 | Translation filed | 04.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 10.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 26.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4424204 (MINAMINO HIROMI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0243248 (PHARMA ROCHE POSAY LAB [FR], et al); | [X]CN105342987 (YAFEI SHANGHAI BIOLOG MEDICINE SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [X]ITUB20159218 (VALITUDO PHARMA SRLS) | International search | [Y]MX2011002098 (DESARROLLOS VPH S A DE C V [MX]) [Y] 25,26 * , the whole document *; | [A]RU2493852 (KLOPOTENKO LEONID LEONIDOVICH [RU]) [A] 19-22, 25, 26 * , the whole document *; | [Y]WO2019039931 (ATSO CORP AFFAIRS S A DE C V [MX]) [Y] 25,26 * , the whole document *; | [XY] - PUGLIA C. et al., "Nanoemulsions as vehicles for topical administration of glycyrrhetic acid: Characterization and in vitro and in vivo evaluation", Drug Delivery, (20100802), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 123 - 129, XP055791292 [X] 19-22 * the whole document * [Y] 25,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10717540903581679 | [XY] - Mishra, Moumita; Shegokar, Ranjita; Gohla, Sven; Muller, Rainer H., "Improved skin penetration of hydrophobic Glycyrrhetinic Acid SmartCrystal@ compared to its water soluble salt", Drug Delivery Letters, (20171201), vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.2174/2210303107666170929115817, ISSN 2210-3031, pages 211 - 218, XP055902282 [X] 19-22 * , the whole document * [Y] 25,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/2210303107666170929115817 | [A] - Hong-Mei Zhuang,Xiao Hu,Shu-Rong Hong,Ping-Ping Zhou, Yu Zhang ,Ling Li, "18a-Glycyrrhetinic acid inhibits the viability of HR 5-CL11 cervical carcinoma cells through induction of apoptosis and DNA damage", Bangladesh J Pharmacol, (20160826), vol. 11, no. 3, doi:10.3329/bjp.v11i3.26592 , ISSN 1991-0088, pages 750 - 755, XP055902283 [A] 19-22, 25, 26 * , the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3329/bjp.v11i3.26592 | by applicant | - HAO J. et al., Int J. Pharmaceut., (20100000), vol. 399, pages 102 - 108 | - LI, S. et al., Drug Dev. Ind. Pharm., (20120000), vol. 38, pages 855 - 865 | - S. LI et al., "Medium: PBS 7.4 Speed: 280 rpm", Skin Pharmacol Physiol, (20120000), vol. 25, pages 257 - 268 | - PUGLIA C. et al., "Medium: Ethanol-Water (50:50) Speed: 500 rpm", Drug delivery, (20100000), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 123 - 129 |