EP4008755 - AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kansai Paint Co., Ltd 33-1, Kanzaki-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-8555 / JP | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBO, Yoshitaka c/o KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD., 1, Hirachi, Azabu-cho Miyoshi-shi, Aichi 470-0206 / JP | 02 /
MIZUTANI, Yusuke c/o KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD., 1, Hirachi, Azabu-cho Miyoshi-shi, Aichi 470-0206 / JP | 03 /
INAGAKI, Takuya c/o KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD., 1, Hirachi, Azabu-cho Miyoshi-shi, Aichi 470-0206 / JP | 04 /
YOKOTA, Gen c/o KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD., 1, Hirachi, Azabu-cho Miyoshi-shi, Aichi 470-0206 / JP | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/23] | Application number, filing date | 20849677.8 | 08.06.2020 | [2022/23] | WO2020JP22557 | Priority number, date | JP20190143045 | 02.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019143045 | [2022/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021024604 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4008755 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/02, C09D133/00, C09D161/28, C09D167/00, C09D7/63, C08G63/137, B05D7/00, C08L61/28, // C08K5/00, C08K5/3492 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
C09D5/024 (EP);
C09D133/08 (US);
C08G63/137 (EP);
C08L61/28 (EP);
C09D161/28 (US);
C09D167/04 (US);
C09D5/08 (US);
C09D7/63 (EP);
B05D1/02 (EP);
B05D2202/10 (EP);
B05D2451/00 (EP);
B05D7/574 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D133/066, C08L61/28, C08L67/00 (EP);
C09D143/02, C08L61/28, C08L67/00 (EP);
B05D2451/00, B05D2401/10, B05D2401/20, B05D2401/10 (EP);
B05D2451/00, B05D2401/20, B05D2401/20, B05D2401/10 (EP);
C08F220/1804, C08F212/08, C08F220/1818, C08F220/20, C08F230/02, C08F230/02 (EP);
C08F220/1804, C08F220/1802, C08F220/14, C08F220/20, C08F220/06, C08F212/08, C08F222/385 (EP) (-) |
Former IPC [2022/23] | C09D5/02, C09D133/00, C09D161/28, C09D167/00, C09D7/63 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/23] | English: | AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITION | [2022/23] | French: | COMPOSITION AQUEUSE DE REVÊTEMENT | [2022/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2022 | Translation filed | 07.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005220288 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD); | [A]JP2009262002 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD, et al) | International search | [A]JP2007009059 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD); | [Y]WO2012036183 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2014009288 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD); | [XY]JP2014125558 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD); | [Y]JP2015140419 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) | by applicant | JPS52107029 | JP2002308993 |