Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022282112 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP22557 | 08.06.2020 | JP2019143045 | 02.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2021024604 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP22557 | 08.06.2020 | JP2019143045 | 02.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114174439B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2023 | B | CN114174439 | 11.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP22557 | 08.06.2020 | JP2019143045 | 02.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3148742 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2024 | C | CA3148742 | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP22557 | 08.06.2020 | JP2019143045 | 02.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4008755 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2023 | A4 | EP4008755 | 08.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP22557 | 08.06.2020 | JP2019143045 | 02.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021024604 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019143045 | 02.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202112985 | 01.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019143045 | 02.08.2019 |