EP4012062 - ALUMINUM ALLOY FOR 3D PRINTING OR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING, 3D PRINTING OR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING METHOD USING SAME, AND ALUMINUM ALLOY PRODUCT OR COMPONENT MANUFACTURED BY 3D PRINTING OR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acts Technologies Inc. Rm. 1840, 382, Gangnam-daero Gangnam-gu Seoul 06232 / KR | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Goon Hee 101-205, 16, Yeongdong-daero 142-gil Gangnam-gu Seoul 06076 / KR | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20849746.1 | 07.08.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020KR10493 | Priority number, date | KR20190096337 | 07.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190096337 | [2022/24] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021025531 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012062 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/06, C22F1/047, C22C1/04, B22F3/10, B33Y70/00, B33Y80/00, B33Y40/20, // B22F10/20, B33Y10/00 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
C22F1/047 (EP,KR);
C22C21/06 (EP,KR);
B22F3/10 (KR);
B33Y40/20 (EP);
B33Y70/00 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
C22C1/0416 (EP,KR);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F10/20, B22F10/64 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/24] | C22C21/06, C22F1/047, C22C1/04, B22F3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG FÜR 3D-DRUCK- ODER GENERATIVE FERTIGUNG, 3D-DRUCK- ODER GENERATIVES FERTIGUNGSVERFAHREN, DAS DIESE LEGIERUNG VERWENDET; UND MIT 3D-DRUCK ODER GENERATIVER FERTIGUNG HERGESTELLTES PRODUKT ODER BAUTEIL AUS DIESER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG | [2022/24] | English: | ALUMINUM ALLOY FOR 3D PRINTING OR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING, 3D PRINTING OR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING METHOD USING SAME, AND ALUMINUM ALLOY PRODUCT OR COMPONENT MANUFACTURED BY 3D PRINTING OR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2022/24] | French: | ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM POUR IMPRESSION 3D OU FABRICATION ADDITIVE, PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION 3D OU DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE UTILISANT CELUI-CI, ET PRODUIT OU COMPOSANT D'ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM FABRIQUÉ PAR IMPRESSION 3D OU FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2022 | Translation filed | 07.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 03.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5573608 (MIYAKE YOSHIHARU [JP], et al); | [A]US2017298477 (PALM FRANK [DE]); | [I]CN108486433 (UNIV JIANGSU SCIENCE & TECH); | [A]WO2019109135 (UNIV MONASH [AU]); | International search | [A]US2017121794 (LENCZOWSKI BLANKA [DE]) [A] 1-20* See paragraph [0002] and claims 1 and 12. *; | [X]US2017298477 (PALM FRANK [DE]) [X] 1-7,15-20 * See paragraph [0025] and claims 1-4. *; | [A]KR20170127010 (ARCONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0033] and [0037] and claim 28. *; | [X]WO2019109135 (UNIV MONASH [AU]) [X] 1-20 * See claims 1-2, 8-9, 11, 13 and 16. *; | [A]KR20190067930 (ARCONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1, 5 and 15. * |