Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
31.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.07.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
07.07.2023 | Change - classification | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
07.07.2023 | Change - classification | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
07.10.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
07.10.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
01.08.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.05.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
12.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.02.2022 | Change - representative | |
20.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.02.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |