Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021024825 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP30436 | 02.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022255400 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP30436 | 02.08.2019 | WO2020JP28629 | 27.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102635551B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2024 | B1 | KR20220024698 | 03.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP30436 | 02.08.2019 | WO2020JP28629 | 27.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7313790B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2023 | B2 | JPWO2021024825 | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP30436 | 02.08.2019 | WO2020JP28629 | 27.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114175467 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP30436 | 02.08.2019 | WO2020JP28629 | 27.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4009498 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2023 | A4 | EP4009498 | 08.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP30436 | 02.08.2019 | WO2020JP28629 | 27.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202220342 | 16.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019JP30436 | 02.08.2019 | WO2020JP28629 | 27.07.2020 |