Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
11.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.06.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
14.10.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
14.10.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
12.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.05.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
13.05.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
18.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.02.2022 | Change - representative | |
04.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.02.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |