Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11816875 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | B2 | US2022319168 | 06.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201910727332 | 07.08.2019 | WO2020CN107975 | 07.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4012606 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2023 | A4 | EP4012606 | 15.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201910727332 | 07.08.2019 | WO2020CN107975 | 07.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021023310 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201910727332 | 07.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112347814 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201910727332 | 07.08.2019 |