EP4011869 - CRYSTAL FORM D OF PYRAZINE-2(1H)-KETONE COMPOUND AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhangzhou Pien Tze Huang Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 1, Hupo Road Xiangcheng District Zhangzhou Fujian Province, 363000 / CN | [2023/46] |
Former [2022/24] | For all designated states Zhangzhou Pien Tze Huang Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd No. 1, Hupo Road Xiangcheng District Zhangzhou Fujian Province, 363000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Zhiliang Shang Street Z hangzhou, Fujian 363000 / CN | 02 /
LUO, Zhiyi Shang Street Z hangzhou, Fujian 363000 / CN | 03 /
ZHUANG, Yichao Shang Street Z hangzhou, Fujian 363000 / CN | 04 /
LIN, Jinxia Shang Street Z hangzhou, Fujian 363000 / CN | 05 /
GAO, Longhui Shang Street Z hangzhou, Fujian 363000 / CN | 06 /
FU, Zhifei 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 07 /
LUO, Miaorong 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 08 /
ZHANG, Yang 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 09 /
LI, Jian 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 10 /
CHEN, Shuhui 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20850461.3 | 04.08.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020CN106901 | Priority number, date | CN201910731106 | 08.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910731106 | CN20191159942 | 01.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911059942 | [2022/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021023195 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4011869 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4011869 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61K31/4965, A61P35/00, C07D403/14 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/497 (EP);
C07B2200/13 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/24] | C07D241/18, C07D241/20, A61K31/495, A61K31/4965, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLFORM D EINER PYRAZIN-2(1H)-KETONVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAFÜR | [2022/24] | English: | CRYSTAL FORM D OF PYRAZINE-2(1H)-KETONE COMPOUND AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/24] | French: | FORME CRISTALLINE D DE COMPOSÉ PYRAZINE-2(1H)-CÉTONE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2022 | Translation filed | 08.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 15.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |