EP4012155 - DRILLING TIP AND DRILLING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MMC RYOTEC CORPORATION 1528 Yokoi Nakashinden Godo-cho Anpachi-gun Gifu 503-2301 / JP | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Kazuyoshi c/o MMC RYOTEC CORPORATION 1528, Yokoinakashinden Godo-cho Anpachi-gun, Gifu 503-2301 / JP | 02 /
TAKATSUKI, Hiroki c/o MMC RYOTEC CORPORATION 1528, Yokoinakashinden Godo-cho Anpachi-gun, Gifu 503-2301 / JP | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20850786.3 | 17.01.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020JP01422 | Priority number, date | JP20190145480 | 07.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019145480 | [2022/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021024512 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012155 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/56 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
E21B10/56 (EP,US);
E21B10/43 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | BOHRSPITZE UND BOHRWERKZEUG | [2022/24] | English: | DRILLING TIP AND DRILLING TOOL | [2022/24] | French: | POINTE DE FORAGE ET OUTIL DE FORAGE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2022 | Translation filed | 01.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 23.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014182947 (BHATIA LOKESH [US], et al) [X] 1,13* paragraphs [0041] - [0051]; figures 2, 3 *; | [XAI]US2017362899 (BELNAP LYNN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11,13 * paragraphs [0024] - [0032]; figures 1,3A,3B * [A] 12 [I] 4,5,8,14,15 | International search | [A]JPS60199190 (NL PETROLEUM PROD) [A] 1-15* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JPH06212874 (SANDVIK AB) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001], fig. 13(a)-13(b) *; | [A]US2015129310 (NEWMAN COLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * entire text, all drawings *; | [X]US2017362899 (BELNAP LYNN [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-7, 9- 11, 13-15 * paragraphs [0002]-[0006], [0024]-[0033], fig. 1, 3A-5 * | by applicant | JPH07293173 | JP2012057310 | JP2019145480 |