EP4010628 - LIGHT SOURCE HAVING A VARIABLE ASYMMETRIC BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LensVector Inc. 6203 San Ignacio Avenue, Suite 110 San José, CA 95119 / US | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALSTIAN, Tigran 1007, Ave Myrand Quebec, Québec G1V 2W1 / CA | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20851111.3 | 07.08.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020CA51086 | Priority number, date | US201962883795P | 07.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962883795 P | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021022380 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4010628 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F21V13/04, F21V14/00, F21V5/00, F21V7/00 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
F21V14/003 (EP,US);
F21V13/02 (EP,US);
F21V7/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLE MIT EINEM VARIABLEN ASYMMETRISCHEN STRAHL | [2022/24] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE HAVING A VARIABLE ASYMMETRIC BEAM | [2022/24] | French: | SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE À FAISCEAU ASYMÉTRIQUE VARIABLE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 06.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4570204 (CAIMI FRANK M [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010271684 (WOODGATE GRAHAM JOHN [GB], et al) [I] 1-11 * figures 4,29 *; | [A]WO2015103709 (UNIVERSITÉ LAVAL [CA]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 26 *; | [A]US2016139316 (SPEIER INGO [CA], et al) [A] 1-11* figure 5a *; | [AD]WO2017041167 (LENSVECTOR INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0027] *; | [XI]EP3215891 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0017] , [0018] , [0019] , [0020] * * figures 1a-1c,4,5 * [I] 8; | [XI]EP3215784 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * figures 2b,4,5,6,9,11 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0062] * [I] 8 | International search | [A]CA2942063 (COELUX SRL [IT]) [A] 1 to 11* The entire document *; | [A]WO2017041167 (LENSVECTOR INC [US], et al) [A] 1 to 11 * The entire document *; | [X]WO2017097508 (OSRAM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 to 3, 8,10 and 11 * Figure 3 and 4, description pages 2, 20, 21 *; | [A]WO2018045469 (LENSVECTOR INC [US], et al) [A] 1 to 11 * The entire document *; | [A]US2018313510 (ALBOU PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1 to 11 * The entire document * |