Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11306775 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2022 | B2 | US2021040987 | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016986050 | 05.08.2020 | US201962883577 | 06.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114556066 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US45058 | 05.08.2020 | US201962883577 | 06.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3149637 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US45058 | 05.08.2020 | US201962883577 | 06.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4010672 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2023 | A4 | EP4010672 | 15.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US45058 | 05.08.2020 | US201962883577 | 06.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022001363 | 27.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US45058 | 05.08.2020 | US201962883577 | 06.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021026267 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962883577 | 06.08.2019 |