EP4012418 - AUTOMATED ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Shunsuke c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECH CORPORATION, 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 02 /
SAKAZUME, Taku c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECH CORPORATION, 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20851378.8 | 21.02.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020JP07029 | Priority number, date | JP20190147021 | 09.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019147021 | [2022/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021029093 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012418 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4012418 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, G16H10/40, G06F3/0485, G06F3/04842, G06F3/04847, G16H40/63, G06F3/0482 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
G01N35/00722 (EP,US);
G06F3/04847 (EP,US);
G01N35/00663 (EP);
G01N35/1002 (US);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/04842 (EP);
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G16H10/40 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/34] | G01N35/00, G16H10/40, G06F3/0485 | ||
Former IPC [2022/24] | G01N35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTER ANALYSATOR | [2022/24] | English: | AUTOMATED ANALYZER | [2022/24] | French: | ANALYSEUR AUTOMATISÉ | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2022 | Translation filed | 11.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 29.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8706303 (KUWANO KEISUKE [JP], et al); | [XA]US2014152820 (HEYDLAUF MICHAEL W [US]) | International search | [Y]JP2004502179 ; | [Y]JP2008051723 (SYSMEX CORP); | [Y]JP2011508881 ; | [A]US2014100791 (DARMSTADT ADAM [US], et al); | [Y]JP2015099160 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP); | [A]JP2018163157 (RADIOMETER MEDICAL APS) |