08.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
29.12.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] |
19.12.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.12.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.12.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.07.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
14.07.2023 |
Change - English title |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
14.07.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
03.03.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.03.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
21.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
30.09.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.09.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
05.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
29.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
15.04.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
02.04.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
09.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
02.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|