EP4016651 - LIGHT-EMITTING ENCAPSULATION ASSEMBLY, LIGHT-EMITTING MODULE AND DISPLAY SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quanzhou Sanan Semiconductor Technology Co., Ltd. Yuanqian Village Shijing Town Nanan City Quanzhou, Fujian 362343 / CN | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIAO, Yanqiu No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Junpeng No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | 03 /
XIN, Shuning No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | 04 /
HSU, Chen-ke No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | 05 /
LIN, Zhen-duan No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | 06 /
YU, Changchin No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | 07 /
CAO, Aihua No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | 08 /
LIAO, Chi-wei No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | 09 /
WU, Zheng No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | 10 /
LEE, Chia-en No.1721-1725, Lvling Road, Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361009 / CN | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20851720.1 | 28.06.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020CN98499 | Priority number, date | CN201921314132U | 13.08.2019 Original published format: CN 201921314132 U | CN201921553485U | 18.09.2019 Original published format: CN 201921553485 U | CN202010234735 | 30.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010234735 | [2022/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021027406 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016651 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, H01L33/62 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP,KR,US);
H01L25/167 (EP);
H01L27/156 (KR);
H01L33/483 (KR);
H01L33/52 (KR);
H01L33/54 (EP,US);
H01L33/62 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | H01L33/62, H01L25/075 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VERKAPSELUNGSANORDNUNG, LICHTEMITTIERENDES MODUL UND ANZEIGESCHIRM | [2022/25] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING ENCAPSULATION ASSEMBLY, LIGHT-EMITTING MODULE AND DISPLAY SCREEN | [2022/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ENCAPSULATION ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT, MODULE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2022 | Translation filed | 07.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 29.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2015117273 (CREE HUIZHOU SOLID STATE LIGHTING CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,8-12 * figures 7,8 * * paragraph [0076] * [A] 4,13,14 [Y] 5-7,15; | [XAY]US2018190184 (KIM JINMO [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,8-12 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0041] - [0059] * [A] 4,13,14 [Y] 5-7,15; | [YA]US2019019780 (KIM KYOUNG JUN [KR], et al) [Y] 5-7,15 * figures 20-27 * * paragraphs [0128] - [0171] *[A] 1-4,8-14 | International search | [A]US2015053258 (BECK MARKUS EBERHARD [US]) [A] 1-31* entire document *; | [X]CN109216525 (PLAYNITRIDE INC) [X] 1-10, 15-24 * description, paragraphs [0045]-[0057], figures 1-6 *; | [Y]CN109755374 (SJ SEMICONDUCTOR CORP) [Y] 11-14, 25-31 * description, paragraphs [0078]-[0084], and figure 14 *; | [X]CN209015627U (FOSHAN NATIONSTAR OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1-10, 15-24 * description, paragraphs [0023]-[0058], and figures 2-6 *; | [Y]CN209015627U (FOSHAN NATIONSTAR OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 11-14, 25-31 * description, paragraphs [0023]-[0058], and figures 2-6 *; | [PX]CN210040253U (XIAMEN SANAN OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * claims 1-15, description, paragraphs [0042]-[0079], figures 1-17 *; | [PX]CN210403725U (XIAMEN SANAN OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) [PX] 16-31 * claims 1-16, description, paragraphs [0028]-[0042], figures 1-10 * |