EP4016849 - LDPC CODING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND BASE STATION AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yueqiang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Caihong ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | WBH Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB Müllerstraße 40 80469 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20851881.1 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020CN102814 | Priority number, date | CN201910754120 | 15.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910754120 | [2022/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021027488 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016849 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/11, H04L1/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H03M13/116 (EP);
H03M13/1102 (CN);
H03M13/1148 (CN);
H03M13/1188 (EP);
H03M13/611 (EP);
H04L1/0057 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LDPC-CODIERUNG UND BASISSTATION UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/25] | English: | LDPC CODING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND BASE STATION AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE LDPC, ET STATION DE BASE ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2022 | Translation filed | 14.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3522378 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-12 * claims 1,3 * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0158] * [I] 3,8; | [XI] - NGUYEN TRAM THI BAO ET AL, "Efficient QC-LDPC Encoder for 5G New Radio", ELECTRONICS, (20190613), vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.3390/electronics8060668, page 668, XP055950547 [X] 1-10 * page 1 - page 10 * [I] 11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/electronics8060668 | [A] - ZTE ZTE MICROELECTRONICS, "Consideration on LDPC design for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1611112 CONSIDERATION ON LDPC CODES FOR NR FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161113), XP051175094 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |