Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4016849
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.07.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.07.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.05.2024 |
First examination report |
|
09.05.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.01.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.10.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
21.10.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
24.08.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
19.08.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
19.08.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
20.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
20.05.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
25.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.03.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
14.03.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|