Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4016849 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2022 | A4 | EP4016849 | 22.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN102814 | 17.07.2020 | CN201910754120 | 15.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA202203024 | 29.06.2022 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN102814 | 17.07.2020 | CN201910754120 | 15.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021027488 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201910754120 | 15.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112398483 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201910754120 | 15.08.2019 |