EP4013229 - BACTERIA AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dead Sea and Arava Science Center National Park Masada D.N. 86910 Dead Sea / IL | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AL ASHHAB, Ashraf 67 Barquq street Kafer Aqab, East Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
BAR-LAVAN, Yael 172 8682000 Ein Yahav / IL | 03 /
WINTERS, Gidon Arava moving post 8684000 Moshav Idan / IL | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20852088.2 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020IL50890 | Priority number, date | US201962885386P | 12.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962885386 P | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021028922 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4013229 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/20, A01N63/22, C12R1/07, C12R1/125, C12R1/18, C12N1/20, A01P3/00 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
A01N63/20 (EP,IL,US);
A01N63/22 (EP,IL,US);
A01P3/00 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,IL,US);
C12R2001/01 (EP,IL);
C12R2001/07 (EP,IL,US);
C12R2001/125 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | A01N63/20, A01N63/22, C12R1/07, C12R1/125, C12R1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | BAKTERIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/25] | English: | BACTERIA AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2022/25] | French: | BACTÉRIES ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 21.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 17.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.06.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008009795 (UNIV REIMS CHAMPAGNE ARDENNE U [FR], et al) [I] 1-11 * claim - * * example - * * Bacillus subtilis (PTA-271) and Pantoea agglomerans (PTA-AF1 and PTA-AF2) *; | [I]CN104263673 (JIANGSU POLYTECHNIC COLLEGE AGRICULTURE & FORESTRY) [I] 1-11 * abstract ** claim - *; | [I] - RANA HAIDAR ET AL, "Modes of action for biological control of Botrytis cinerea by antagonistic bacteria", PHYTOPATHOLOGIA MEDITERRANEA, IT, (20160101), vol. 55, no. 3, doi:10.14601/Phytopathol_Mediterr-18079, ISSN 0031-9465, pages 301 - 322, XP055627085 [I] 1-11 * abstract * * table 1 * * table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.14601/Phytopathol_Mediterr-18079 | International search | [A]KR20110037549 (REPUBLIC KOREA MAN RURAL DEV [KR]) [A] 5,9-11* ab stract *; | [XY]WO2016108974 (FMC CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * page 3 first paragraph, example 2, table 1 page 3 first paragraph, example 2, table 1 * [Y] 6,7; | [XY] - El-Sayed Wael S., Akhkha Abdellah, El-Naggar Moustafa Y., Elbadry Medhat, "In vitro antagonistic activity, plant growth promoting traits and phylogenetic affiliation of rhizobacteria associated with wild plants grown in arid soil", Frontiers in microbiology, vol. 5, no. 651, doi:0.3389/fmicb.2014.00651, (20140000), pages 1 - 11, URL: https://www.frontiersin.org/articles/10.3389/fmicb.2014.00651/full, (20201123), XP055793204 [X] 1-5,8-11 * 04 Dec 2014 (2014/12/04) abstract, tables 1 and 2, Figure 3, GeneBank Accession Nos: AB793788, AB793794, AB793793, AB793790 abstract, tables 1 and 2, Figure 3, GeneBank Accession Nos: AB793788, AB793794, AB793793, AB793790 * [Y] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fmicb.2014.00651 | [XY] - Köberl Martina, Müller Henry, Ramadan Elshahat M., Berg Gabriele, "Desert farming benefits from microbial potential in arid soils and promotes diversity and plant health", PLoS One, vol. 6, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0024452, (20110000), pages 1 - 9, URL: https://journals.plos.org/plosone/article?id=10.1371/journal.pone.0024452, (20201123), XP055793208 [X] 1-5,8-11 * 02 Sep 2011 (2011/09/02) page 2 left column first paragraph, "Materials and Methods" on page 6, table 2, paragraph spanning page 3-4, Fig. 5,page 5 left column, page 5 left column, Table S2 page 2 left column first paragraph, "Materials and Methods" on page 6, table 2, paragraph spanning page 3-4, Fig. 5,page 5 left column, page 5 left column, Table S2 * [Y] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0024452 | [Y] - SILINI-CHERIF, H. et al., "Isolation and characterization of plant growth promoting traits of a rhizobacteria: Pantoea agglomerans lma2", Pakistan journal of biological sciences: PJBS, vol. 15, no. 6, doi: 10.3923/pjbs.2012.267.276, (20120000), pages 1 - 11, URL: https://scialert.net/abstract/?doi=pjbs.2012.267.276, (20201124), XP055793233 [Y] 6,7,9-11 * 01 Mar 2012 (2012/03/01) * | [Y] - Dutkiewicz Jacek, Mackiewicz Barbara, Lemieszek Marta Kinga, Golec Marcin, Milanowski Janusz, "Pantoea agglomerans: a mysterious bacterium of evil and good. Part IV. Beneficial effects", Annals of Agricultural and Environmental Medicine, vol. 23, no. 2, doi:10.5604/12321966.1203879, (20160000), pages 206 - 222, URL: http://www.aaem.pl/Pantoea-agglomerans-a-mysterious-bacterium-of-evil-and-good-Part-IV-Beneficial-effects,72401,0,2.html, (20201124), XP055793240 [Y] 6,7,9-11 * 30 Jun 2016 (2016/06/30) (page 211-212 under "Combating fungal pathogens", FIG 2, page 212 under "Combating other pathogens and pests", page 212 left column second paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5604/12321966.1203879 |