EP4019634 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 18.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Edificio EMPRENDIA - Campus Vida 15782 Santiago de Compostela, La Coruña / ES | For all designated states Servizo Galego De Saúde Edificio Administrativo de San Lázaro s/n 15703 Santiago de Compostela, A Coruna / ES | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÁLVAREZ VILLAMARÍN, Clara UNIVERSIDADE DE SANTIAGO DE COMPOSTELA Edificio EMPRENDIA - Campus Vida 15782 Santiago de Compostela, A Coruña / ES | 02 /
SOUSA RODRIGUES, Joana UNIVERSIDADE DE SANTIAGO DE COMPOSTELA Edificio EMPRENDIA - Campus Vida 15782 Santiago de Compostela, A Coruña / ES | 03 /
CAMESELLE TEIJEIRO, José Manuel Choupana, s/n 15707 Santiago de Compostela, A Coruña / ES | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20852474.4 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020ES70512 | Priority number, date | ES20190030743 | 13.08.2019 Original published format: ES 201930743 | [2022/26] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021028610 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | ES | [2021/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4019634 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K48/00, A61P35/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
C12Y203/02 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2022/26] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER | [2022/26] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2022 | Translation filed | 22.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 18.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - FU J ET AL, "MDA5 is SUMOylated by PIAS2@b in the upregulation of Type I interferon signaling", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0161-5890, (20110101), pages 415 - 422, (20101229), XP027578509 [X] 1-4 * page 416 * [I] 1-6 | [A] - VAN DEN AKKER EMILE ET AL, "FLI-1 Functionally Interacts with PIASx[alpha], a Member of the PIAS E3 SUMO Ligase Family", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20051101), vol. 280, no. 45, doi:10.1074/jbc.M502938200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 38035 - 38046, XP093056234 [A] 1-6,11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M502938200 | [XI] - WANG WEIBIN ET AL, "PIASx[alpha] Ligase Enhances SUMO1 Modification of PTEN Protein as a SUMO E3 Ligase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20140201), vol. 289, no. 6, doi:10.1074/jbc.M113.508515, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 3217 - 3230, XP093056237 [X] 1-4 * page 3218 * [I] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M113.508515 | [XI] - WANG JUNJIE ET AL, "Protein inhibitor of activated STAT x[alpha] depresses cyclin D and cyclin D kinase, and contributes to the inhibition of osteosarcoma cell progression", MOLECULAR MEDICINE REPORTS, GR, (20151222), vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.3892/mmr.2015.4705, ISSN 1791-2997, pages 1645 - 1652, XP093056819 [X] 1-4 * page 1646 * [I] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/mmr.2015.4705 | International search | [XA]US2012040460 (RIGOUTSOS ISIDORE [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 14-20 * , todo el documento. En particular, secuencia 214599 * [A] 21-32; | [A]US2018071282 (CASTRO RAMIRO [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 14-32* , todo el documento. *; | [XA] - Ali Md. Moksed, Yoshizawa Tatsuya, Ishibashi Osamu, Matsuda Akio, Ikegame Mika, Shimomura Junko, Mera Hisashi, Nakashima Kazuhisa, Kawashima Hiroyuki, "PIASxβ is a key regulator of osterix transcriptional activity and matrix mineralization in osteoblasts", Journal of Cell Science, (20070000), vol. 120, no. 15, doi: pubmed:17623776, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 2565 - 2573, XP055816806 [X] 1-4, 14-20 * . todo el documento. En particular, párrafo 6, pag. 2572. * [A] 21-32 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.005090 | [A] - Luo Jun, Zhang Cheng, Wang Congyi, Li Linjun, Li Chunhong, Li Qiang, Zhang Min, Wu Qingchen, "Miz-1 promotes the proliferation of esophageal cancer cells via suppression of p21 and release of p21-arrested cyclin Dl", Oncology Reports, (20160000), vol. 35, no. 6, doi: 10.3892/or.2016.4731 pubmed:27109891, ISSN 1791-2431, pages 3532 - 3540, XP055816808 [A] 1-4, 14-32 * . todo el documento. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/or.2016.4731 | [A] - Tuccilli C, Baldini E, Sorrenti S, Di Gioia C, Bosco D, Ascoli V, Mian C, Barollo S, Rendina R, Coccaro C, Pepe M, Catania A, Bononi M, Tartaglia F, De Antoni E, D'armiento M, Ulisse S, "Papillary thyroid cancer is characterized by altered expression of genes involved in the sumoylation process", Journal of Biological Regulators And Homeostatic Agents, (20150000), vol. 29, no. 3, doi: pubmed:26403403, ISSN 0393-974X, pages 655 - 662, XP055816809 [A] 1-4, 14-32 * . todo el documento. * | by applicant | EP0919565 | - STEINCOHEN, Cancer Res, (19880000), vol. 48, page 2659 | - VAN DER KROL et al., BioTechniques, (19880000), vol. 6, page 958 | - QUE-GEWIRTH NS, Gene Ther, (20070200), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 283 - 91 | - ONEY S., "Oligonucleotides", Fall, (20070000), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 265 - 74 | - PEARSON W.R., Curr Protoc Bioinformatics, (20130600), vol. 03 | - PERVOUCHINE, D.D., RNA, (20141000), vol. 20, no. 10, pages 1519 - 1531 | - XIE et al., BMC Biol, (20190000), vol. 17, page 62 | - ELLIOT et al., Nat. Commun., (20190000), vol. 10, page 3401 | - "Uniprot", Database accession no. 075928-1 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NP 001310988.1 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res, vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - HENIKOFFHENIKOFF, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - EL MOTIAM A et al., FASEB Journal, (20190000), vol. 33, pages 643 - 649 | - SHAMAH et al., Acc. Chem. Res., (20080000), vol. 41, pages 130 - 8 | - CHENLO M et al., EBioMedicine, (20190000), vol. 43, pages 537 - 552 | - GARCIA M et al., Sci. Rep., (20170000), vol. 7, page 42937 | - GARCIA-RENDUELES A.R. et al., Oncogene, (20170000), vol. 36, no. 5, pages 652 - 666 | - BRAVO S.B. et al., J Clin Endocrinol Metab, (20130000), vol. 98, no. 6, pages 2431 - 2441 | - DIAZ-RODRIGUEZ E et al., Oncogene, (20120000), vol. 31, no. 23, pages 2824 - 35 | - BRAVO SB et al., Anal Biochem., (20100000), vol. 400, no. 2, pages 219 - 28 | - TAKESHITA et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Science of the USA, (20050000), vol. 102, no. 34, pages 12177 - 12182 | - BARCZAK et al., Molecular Biotechnology, (20150000), vol. 57, no. 2, pages 195 - 200 | - LUKINAVICIUS et al., Nature Communication, (20150000), vol. 6, page 8497 | - RADONIC et al., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20040000), vol. 313, no. 4, pages 856 - 62 | - BRAVO et al., International Journal of Peptides, (20110000), vol. 2011, page 969818 | - SEWELL et al., Journal Visualized Experiments, (20130000), vol. 74, page 50097 | - INOUE et al., Int J Biomed Imaging, (20100000), vol. 2010, page 471408 | - STEWART et al., Nature, (20170000), vol. 549, no. 7670, pages 96 - 100 | - OCHIYA et al., Current Gene Therapy, (20010000), vol. 1, pages 31 - 52 | - TAKEI et al., Cancer Research, (20040000), vol. 64, pages 3365 - 3370 | - TAKAHASHI et al., PLoS One, (20130000), vol. 8, no. 8, page e73214 | - SASAKI et al., Biochemical Biophysics Research Communication, (20100000), vol. 399, no. 1, pages 1075 - 1079 | - JACOBY WG, Electoral Studies, (20000000), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 577 - 613 | - Human Protein Atlas, URL: www.proteinatlas.org | - ARORA et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, no. 24, pages 21327 - 30 | - GALANTI et al., Nature, (20090000), vol. 462, no. 7275, pages 935 - 9 | - GORETZKI et al., Recent Results Cancer Res., (19900000), vol. 118, pages 48 - 63 | - PAULIN et al., C. R. Acad. Sci. III, (19920000), vol. 315, no. 12, pages 493 - 8 | - ITO et al., INt. J. Oncol., (19940000), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 583 - 6 | - GIOANNI et al., Bull Cancer, (19910000), vol. 78, no. 11, pages 1053 - 62 | - PALYI et al., Virchows Arch B Cel Pathol. INcl. Mol. Pathol., (19930000), vol. 63, no. 4, pages 263 - 9 | - STENNER et al., Cancer Sci, (20080000), vol. 99, no. 9, pages 1547 - 52 | - WILLIAMS et al., Nat. Genet., (20160000), vol. 48, no. 39, pages 238 - 244 | - MARTINCORENA et al., Cell, (20180000), vol. 173, no. 7, page 1823 | - NAUGHTON et al., Anal. Biochem., (20110000), vol. 417, no. 1, pages 162 - 4 | - AZUMA K et al., Biochem. BIophys. Res. Commun., (20100000), vol. 391, no. 1, pages 1075 - 9 | - SASAKI T et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (20100000), vol. 399, no. 1, pages 79 - 83 |