EP4017143 - POWER CONTROL PARAMETER CONFIGURATION METHOD, TERMINAL, AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Wei No.29 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Runhua No.29 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20852530.3 | 11.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020CN108379 | Priority number, date | CN201910754869 | 15.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910754869 | [2022/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021027805 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4017143 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/24 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04W52/242 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN);
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (CN);
H04W52/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION VON LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNGSPARAMETERN, ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/25] | English: | POWER CONTROL PARAMETER CONFIGURATION METHOD, TERMINAL, AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE PARAMÈTRE DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE, TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉSEAU | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2022 | Translation filed | 21.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN108632971 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [Y]WO2018228437 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN109392144 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]WO2019096317 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [XPI]EP3585111 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [AP]EP3661292 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [E]EP3713312 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [E]EP3962182 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) |