EP4013295 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CARDIOVASCULAR MONITORING AND REPORTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barnacka, Anna 110 Fayerweather Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | For all designated states Bridges, Charles, R. 106 Pine Street Auburndale, MA 02466 / US | For all designated states Patel, Siddarth 26 Park Vale Avenue Apartment 1 Allston, MA 02134 / US | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnacka, Anna 110 Fayerweather Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 02 /
Bridges, Charles, R. 106 Pine Street Auburndale, MA 02466 / US | 03 /
Patel, Siddarth 26 Park Vale Avenue Apartment 1 Allston, MA 02134 / US | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Theunis, Patrick Patrick's Patents BVBA Langbosweg 19 2550 Kontich / BE | Application number, filing date | 20852885.1 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020US46021 | Priority number, date | US201962885364P | 12.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962885364 P | US201962888075P | 16.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962888075 P | US201962888067P | 16.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962888067 P | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021030499 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4013295 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B5/316 (US);
A61B5/021 (US);
A61B5/02116 (EP);
A61B5/318 (US);
A61B5/6815 (US);
A61B5/6817 (EP);
A61B5/7246 (US);
A61B5/7264 (US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
A61B5/7465 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KARDIOVASKULÄREN ÜBERWACHUNG UND BERICHTERSTATTUNG | [2022/25] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CARDIOVASCULAR MONITORING AND REPORTING | [2022/25] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SIGNALEMENT ET DE SURVEILLANCE CARDIOVASCULAIRES | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 13.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016051150 (AARTS RONALDUS MARIA [NL]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * [I] 2-9,11-16; | [XI]US2017347895 (WEI CHUANMIN [CN], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0178] - paragraph [0180] * [I] 2-9,11-16; | [XI]US2018235540 (KIRSZENBLAT ROMAIN [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1,7 * [I] 2-9,11-16; | [A]WO2019019119 (VITA COURSE TECH HAINAN CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-16* paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0101] * | International search | [A]US2017135633 (CONNOR ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1-24* entire document *; | [Y]US2018001184 (TRAN BAO [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * entire document especially Abstract, para [0071]-[0072], para [0289]-[0298], para [0312], para [0390], para [0509]-[0510], para [0555], para [0560], TABLE-US-00001 *; | [Y]US2018235540 (KIRSZENBLAT ROMAIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * entire document especially Abstract, para [0004]-[0015], para [0039]-[0041], para [0046]-[0048], para [0060]-[0069] * | by applicant | US2016051150 | US2017347895 | US2018235540 | WO2019019119 | US10646121 |