EP4011596 - PREFORM, SYNTHETIC RESIN CONTAINER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SYNTHETIC RESIN CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Takanori c/o YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO., LTD., 2-6, Ojima 3- chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8531 / JP | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/27] |
Former [2022/24] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20853295.2 | 14.07.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020JP27412 | Priority number, date | JP20190148052 | 09.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019148052 | [2022/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021029175 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4011596 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4011596 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/06, B29C49/22, B65D1/02, // B29C49/00, B29C55/28, B29C49/02, B29L9/00, B29L31/00, B65D83/00 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
B29C49/071 (EP);
B29C49/06 (KR);
B65D1/0215 (CN,US);
B65D1/023 (US);
B29B11/08 (KR);
B29C49/08 (CN);
B29C49/22 (EP,KR,US);
B29C49/64 (KR);
B29C55/00 (KR);
B29C55/28 (EP);
B65D1/02 (KR);
B65D1/0246 (CN);
B65D1/46 (CN);
B65D83/0055 (EP);
B29C2049/023 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/0741 (EP);
B29C2949/0744 (EP);
B29C2949/0745 (EP);
B29C2949/0778 (EP);
B29C2949/0863 (EP);
B29C2949/3008 (EP);
B29C2949/3012 (EP);
B29C2949/302 (EP);
B29C2949/3026 (EP);
B29C2949/3034 (EP);
B29C2949/3088 (EP);
B29C2949/3094 (EP);
B29L2009/001 (EP);
B29L2031/712 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/24] | B29C49/06, B29C49/22, B65D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORFORM, KUNSTHARZBEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KUNSTHARZBEHÄLTERS | [2022/24] | English: | PREFORM, SYNTHETIC RESIN CONTAINER, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SYNTHETIC RESIN CONTAINER | [2022/24] | French: | PRÉFORME, RÉCIPIENT EN RÉSINE SYNTHÉTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE RÉCIPIENT EN RÉSINE SYNTHÉTIQUE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2022 | Translation filed | 08.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 24.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2508319 (ANHEUSER BUSCH INBEV NV [BE]); | [A]JP2019081604 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP2019112089 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD); | [X]JP2019119476 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) |