EP4015860 - CLUTCH SYSTEM INTERLOCKING WITH ACCELERATOR AND BRAKE PEDAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autodyn Sys Inc. 424Ho, 8Hogwan 119, Academy-ro Yeonsu-gu Incheon 22012 / KR | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Jongyun 216Dong 602Ho, 70, Haesong-ro, Yeonsu-gu Incheon 22000 / KR | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services Limited c/o Caya 83713X Am Börstig 5 96052 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 20853314.1 | 20.07.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020KR09538 | Priority number, date | KR20190099195 | 14.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190099195 | KR20200076343 | 23.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200076343 | [2022/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021029548 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015860 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4015860 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16D21/06, F16D45/00, F16D41/064 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
F16D15/00 (EP);
F16D41/066 (US);
F16D23/12 (EP);
F16D23/14 (US);
F16D41/064 (EP);
F16D2023/123 (EP);
F16D2041/0646 (EP);
F16D2500/31426 (EP);
F16D2500/3144 (EP);
F16D2500/7041 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | F16D21/06, F16D45/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT GAS- UND BREMSPEDAL INEINANDERGREIFENDES KUPPLUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/25] | English: | CLUTCH SYSTEM INTERLOCKING WITH ACCELERATOR AND BRAKE PEDAL | [2022/25] | French: | VERROUILLAGE DU SYSTÈME D'EMBRAYAGE AVEC LA PÉDALE D'ACCÉLÉRATEUR ET LA PÉDALE DE FREIN | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2021 | Translation filed | 09.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 02.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2065980 (KARL MAYBACH); | [X]US8321107 (KARLSSON SVANTE [SE], et al); | [X]US2014067214 (RUEBSAM CHRISTIAN [DE], et al); | [X]DE102013205227 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]US9739371 (BYERLY JOHN [US], et al); | [X]KR20180075132 (HYUNDAI POWERTECH CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [Y]KR200313732Y [Y] 1-8 * See pages 2 and 3 and figures 1 and 2. *; | [A]KR200431446Y [A] 1-8 * See claim 1 and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]JP2008224025 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-8 * See paragraphs [0013], [0014], [0018], [0020], [0021] and [0023]-[0025] and figures 2-5. *; | [A]JP2016156440 (JTEKT CORP) [A] 1-8 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0040] and figures 2-8. *; | [A]US2016298704 (ITAGAKI KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* See paragraphs [0028]-[0048] and figures 1-5C. * | by applicant | KR20190099195 | KR20200034811 | KR20200051364 | KR20190166488 |