|
25.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2022 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2022 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
28.07.2022 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2022 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
13.05.2022 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
08.07.2021 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
09.06.2021 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
09.06.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.06.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.06.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
04.05.2021 |
Communication in Cases for Which No Other Form Is Applicable (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.05.2021 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - description for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.05.2021 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.01.2021 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.01.2021 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.01.2021 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
23.01.2021 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
36 |
|
23.01.2021 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
23.01.2021 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.01.2021 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
23.01.2021 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
23.01.2021 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |