EP4020984 - METHOD FOR ENCODING/DECODING IMAGE SIGNAL AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Bae Keun 1202ho, 214dong, 393, Pangyo-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13490 / KR | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20855033.5 | 20.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020KR11130 | Priority number, date | KR20190102035 | 20.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190102035 | KR20190146654 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20190146654 | [2022/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021034129 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020984 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/119, H04N19/70, H04N19/96, H04N19/172, H04N19/103 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04N19/119 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/23 (CN);
H04N19/103 (EP);
H04N19/107 (CN);
H04N19/172 (EP,KR);
H04N19/174 (KR);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/182 (CN);
H04N19/1883 (US);
H04N19/42 (CN);
H04N19/46 (US);
H04N19/50 (KR);
H04N19/587 (KR);
H04N19/70 (EP);
H04N19/91 (CN);
H04N19/96 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | H04N19/119, H04N19/70, H04N19/96, H04N19/172 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG/DECODIERUNG EINES BILDSIGNALS UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2022/26] | English: | METHOD FOR ENCODING/DECODING IMAGE SIGNAL AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE/DÉCODAGE DE SIGNAL D'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2022 | Translation filed | 17.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CA3105474 (UNIV HANYANG IND UNIV COOP FOUND [KR]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0185] , [0186] , [0202] , [0203] , [0286] , [0288] , [0293] * * figures 2,3,6a-7 * [I] 2-6,8-12; | [I]US2019082178 (KIM YOUN-HEE [KR], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [ 223] - [0241] - [ 254] - [0263] - [ 281] , [ 299] , [ 318] , [ 439] * * figures 13-16 * * tables 1, 5 *; | [A] - Benjamin Bross ET AL, "Versatile Video Coding (Draft 6) - JVET-02001-vD", (20190729), URL: http://phenix.it-sudparis.eu/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/15_Gothenburg/wg11/JVET-O2001-v13.zip, (20201106), XP055747660 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20150092054 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12* See paragraphs [0074]-[0194]; and figures 2a-7. *; | [A]KR20180111377 (CHIPS&MEDIA INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0191]-[0252]; and figures 9-19. *; | [X] - Benjamin Bross, Chen Jianle, Liu Shan, "Versatile Video Coding (Draft 6) - JVET-02001-vD", Joint Video Experts Team (JVET) of ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 and ISO/IEC JTC 1, (20190729), URL: http://phenix.it-sudparis.eu/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/15_Gothenburg/wg11/JVET-O2001-v13.zip, (20201106), XP055747660 [X] 1-12 * See pages 88-89 and 153. * | [A] - Y. He (Interdigital), A. Hamza (InterDigital), "AHG12: On picture and sub-picture signaling", 15. JVET meeting; 20190703 - 20190712; Gothenburg; (the Joint Video Exploration Team of ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 and ITU-T SG.16 ), (20190626), XP030218772 [A] 1-12 * See pages 1-6. * | [A] - J. Chen, Y. Ye, S. Kim, "Algorithm description for Versatile Video Coding and Test Model 6 (VTM 6)", 127. MPEG meeting; 20190708 - 20190712; Gothenburg; (Motion Picture Expert Group or ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11), (20190815), XP030208572 [A] 1-12 * See pages 9-17. * |