EP3996415 - METHODS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DOWNLINK INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING INTERNET OF THINGS, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/19] | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DOWNLINK INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING INTERNET OF THINGS, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | ||
[2023/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jaehyung IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Changhwan IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Joonkui IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20855446.9 | 14.08.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020KR10907 | Priority number, date | KR20190100616 | 16.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190100616 | KR20190123427 | 04.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190123427 | KR20190142959 | 08.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20190142959 | [2022/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021034054 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996415 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3996415 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/26, H04W4/70, // H04L5/00, H04W74/08, H04W72/12, H04W72/04 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H04W28/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W4/30 (CN);
H04L5/0048 (CN);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (CN);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/0446 (CN,KR);
H04W72/1273 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/51 (KR);
H04W74/0833 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H04W28/26, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W4/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON DOWNLINK-INFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT UNTERSTÜTZUNG DES INTERNET DER DINGE UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2022/19] | English: | METHODS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DOWNLINK INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING INTERNET OF THINGS, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2023/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE ET DE RECEVOIR DES INFORMATIONS DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL PRENANT EN CHARGE L'INTERNET DES OBJETS, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2023/20] |
Former [2022/19] | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DOWNLINK INFORMATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SUPPORTING INTERNET OF THINGS, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | ||
Former [2022/19] | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE ET DE RECEVOIR DES INFORMATIONS DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL PRENANT EN CHARGE L'INTERNET DES OBJETS, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2022 | Translation filed | 04.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 20.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Feature lead summary of Coexistence of NB-IoT with NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190516), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1907574, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F97/Docs/R1%2D1907574%2Ezip, (20190516), XP051739878 [X] 1-4,6,7,9-15 * sections 1-4 * [I] 5,8,15 | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Updated feature lead summary of coexistence of NB-IoT with NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an, China; 20190408 - 20190412, (20190415), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1905586 UPDATED FEATURE LEAD SUMMARY OF COEXISTENCE OF NB-IOT WITH NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANT, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F96b/Docs/R1%2D1905586%2Ezip, (20190415), XP051707648 [X] 1-4,10-14 * sections 1-4 * | [X] - NOKIA ET AL, "Coexistence of NB-IoT with NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an, China; 20190408 - 20190412, (20190407), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1904179, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1904179%2Ezip, (20190407), XP051699514 [X] 1-4,10-14 * figures 1, 2 * * sections 1-4 * | International search | [Y]WO2017026781 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0058], [0062]-[0067] and [0128]-[0132]; and claims 1-15. *; | [Y] - Ericsson, "Feature lead summary for Coexistence of LTE-MTC with NR", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #97; R1-1907581, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190516), XP051739883 [Y] 1-20 * See sections 3.1-3.5. * | [Y] - Ericsson, "Coexistence of LTE-MTC with NR", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #97; R1-1905959 Coexistence of LTE-MTC with NR, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Reno, Nevada, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190504), XP051708001 [Y] 7,17 * See sections 3.1-3.5. * | [A] - OPPO, "Multiplexing between slot-based and symbol-based transmissions", 3GPP TSG RAG WG1 Meeting #91; R1-1719974, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Reno, USA; 20171127 - 20171201, (20171118), XP051369670 [A] 1-20 * See sections 1 and 2. * | [A] - Huawei, HiSilicon, "On eMTC co-existence with NR", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #97; R1-1905984, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190504), pages 1 - 3, XP051708026 [A] 1-20 * See sections 2 and 3. * |